U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00184
  • Case Name: Smith v. Cheyenne Retirement Investors LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [10th Circuit Filing]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order]
  • October 17, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Transcript Letter]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Transcript - Appeal]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • August 23, 2017: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • August 02, 2017: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 25, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 25, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 12, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 26, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 16, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 02, 2017: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • June 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 02, 2017: [Dismiss]
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • April 06, 2017: [Status Conference]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 20, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 12, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 12, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • June 30, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.