U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00188
  • Case Name: Marten Transport Ltd v. B&R Oilfield Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
  • December 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • August 09, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • August 05, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • August 05, 2016: [Entry of Default]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 05, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 05, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 05, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.