U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00190
  • Case Name: Suarez v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order]
  • March 23, 2017: [Status Report]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 25, 2016: [Stay Case]
  • July 06, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • July 06, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.