U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00189
  • Case Name: Franken v. Jewell
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Mandate]
  • April 05, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Transcript Letter]
  • March 16, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 16, 2018: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • March 06, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 06, 2018: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • March 06, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 06, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 25, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Reply]
  • December 12, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 08, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 21, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • November 03, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 22, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Status Report]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 06, 2016: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • July 05, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.