U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00193
  • Case Name: J C Energy Services LLC v. Anadarko Petroleum Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 05, 2017: [Pretrial Memorandum]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Reply Brief]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 28, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 14, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Dismiss]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 12, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • October 03, 2016: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 09, 2016: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • September 09, 2016: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 15, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 08, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 08, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.