U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00194
  • Case Name: Lackey v. Wyoming Department of Corrections State Penitentiary Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Reply]
  • October 21, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • October 17, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 26, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 14, 2016: [Brief]
  • September 14, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order]
  • August 02, 2016: [Response]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 12, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • July 12, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • July 11, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.