U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00196
  • Case Name: Hill v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Letter(s)]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on 2255 Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 12, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • July 12, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 12, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.