U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00197
  • Case Name: Hodge v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on 2255 Motion]
  • January 20, 2017: [Reply to Response]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 05, 2016: [Reconsideration]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • November 19, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • November 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 03, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 13, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • July 13, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.