U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00198
  • Case Name: Eklof v. Oscar Renda Contracting Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 15, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • April 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 07, 2017: [Supplement]
  • April 05, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • September 20, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 19, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 09, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 22, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
  • July 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 21, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 15, 2016: [Jury Demand]
  • July 15, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.