U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00016
  • Case Name: Young v. Wyoming Medium Correctional Institution Warden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [USCA Order]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [USCA Notification]
  • October 07, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 29, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • August 29, 2016: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • August 16, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 15, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.