U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00199
  • Case Name: Friends of Animals v. United States Bureau of Land Management et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 16, 2017: [Dismiss]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 08, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • July 06, 2017: [Stay Case]
  • July 06, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 23, 2017: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • June 20, 2017: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • June 14, 2017: [10th Circuit Filing]
  • June 13, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • June 13, 2017: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • June 01, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 30, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 08, 2017: [Supplement]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Reply]
  • February 28, 2017: [Order]
  • February 24, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • February 21, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 07, 2017: [Opposition]
  • February 07, 2017: [Strike]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Brief]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 02, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • September 13, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 28, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 22, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 15, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.