U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00183
  • Case Name: Crandall v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Director et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 05, 2017: [Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 05, 2017: [Response]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Complaint]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 02, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 18, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order]
  • October 12, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 19, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • September 19, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 31, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 18, 2016: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • August 17, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.