U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00204
  • Case Name: Hickey v. Lincoln County School District #2 Board of Trustees et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • September 27, 2017: [Dismiss Case]
  • September 22, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Notice of Failure to Submit Pleadings]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
  • July 14, 2017: [Compel]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 12, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • June 07, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 10, 2017: [Compel]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 09, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 23, 2017: [Reassigning Case]
  • February 21, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 02, 2017: [Change Venue]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order]
  • January 11, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 11, 2017: [Entry of Default]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 14, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • December 07, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • November 22, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • November 03, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 01, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 01, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Dismiss]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 19, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 14, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 31, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 29, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 25, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Jury Demand]
  • July 20, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 20, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.