U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00206
  • Case Name: Wickham v. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Mail Returned]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Response]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order]
  • September 28, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • September 22, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 15, 2016: [Dismiss Case]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 07, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 29, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 25, 2016: [Supplement]
  • August 19, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 11, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 09, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 09, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
  • July 21, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 21, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.