U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00207
  • Case Name: Tenderholt v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [USCA Order]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [USCA Notification]
  • October 25, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [USCA Order]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 15, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on 2255 Motion]
  • July 22, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 22, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 22, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.