U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00208
  • Case Name: Peterson et al v. Vail Resorts Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • November 10, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • November 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 20, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 12, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 12, 2016: [Dismiss Case]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 15, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.