U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00213
  • Case Name: Barajas v. Teton Science School Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 07, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
  • October 03, 2017: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
September, 2017
  • September 24, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • September 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 22, 2017: [Leave to]
  • September 18, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 15, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 15, 2017: [In Limine]
  • September 14, 2017: [In Limine]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • June 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 21, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 15, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 13, 2017: [Reassigning Case]
  • April 13, 2017: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Change Venue]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 06, 2017: [Dismiss]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • January 25, 2017: [Strike]
  • January 23, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 10, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • December 19, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 15, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 15, 2016: [Third Party Complaint]
  • December 09, 2016: [Opposition]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 01, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • September 21, 2016: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 16, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 16, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 02, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • July 26, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.