U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00212
  • Case Name: Bratberg v. Kindred Nursing Centers West LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • November 17, 2017: [Dismiss Case]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • October 17, 2017: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • October 17, 2017: [Status Report]
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Status Report]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Status Report]
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Status Report]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Status Report]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Status Report]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • November 10, 2016: [Status Report Order]
  • November 09, 2016: [Status Report]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 23, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order]
  • August 16, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 09, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 01, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Jury Demand]
  • July 26, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • July 26, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.