U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00214
  • Case Name: Tjaden et al v. Shawver et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Dismissing Case]
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
  • October 04, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • September 09, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.