U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00215
  • Case Name: Arellano v. SavaSeniorCare LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 02, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • October 20, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 14, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 13, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 13, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • October 13, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 12, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 10, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order]
  • September 22, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 04, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 04, 2016: [Complaint]
  • August 04, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.