U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00219
  • Case Name: Tuggle et al v. Colonel of Cheyenne LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • June 22, 2017: [Dismiss Case]
  • June 15, 2017: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • June 12, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
  • June 06, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • June 06, 2017: [Reassigning Case]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 30, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 26, 2017: [Protective Order]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Witness List]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 14, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 02, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 11, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 03, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 12, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 07, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • September 07, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 02, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 30, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 09, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.