U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00013
  • Case Name: Krauchanka v. FedEx Freight Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • May 01, 2017: [Objection]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • April 21, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 21, 2017: [Transcript Letter]
  • April 21, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • April 21, 2017: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • April 21, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • April 18, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 17, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [In Limine]
  • March 23, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 20, 2017: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2017: [Witness List]
  • March 08, 2017: [Reply to Response]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 27, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 24, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 15, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 17, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 03, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 21, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 21, 2016: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 20, 2016: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • December 16, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 16, 2016: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 09, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 28, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 28, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 23, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 15, 2016: [Designation]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 10, 2016: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 10, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.