U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00220
  • Case Name: Miller v. State of Wyoming et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
  • June 05, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
  • June 04, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order]
  • May 18, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 14, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 30, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • April 17, 2018: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • April 11, 2018: [Status Conference]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • March 26, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 28, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Dismissing Party]
  • August 10, 2017: [Show Cause]
  • August 10, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 05, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 21, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • February 13, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • February 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • December 05, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • November 17, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • November 09, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 09, 2016: [Dismiss Case]
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Praecipe]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
  • August 12, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.