U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00221
  • Case Name: Summers v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 05, 2017: [USCA Order]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [USCA Notification]
  • December 07, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 26, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 26, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 06, 2016: [Reconsideration]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on 2255 Motion]
  • August 19, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • August 19, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.