U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00224
  • Case Name: Turning Point Distribution LLC v. Concealed Carry Choices et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Financial Entry]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 03, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • April 03, 2017: [Dismiss Case]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • January 05, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 22, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • December 12, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 02, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 13, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 10, 2016: [Jury Demand]
  • October 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 27, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 15, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.