U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00225
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Natrona County Detention Center Administrator et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 13, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 13, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 04, 2019: [Reply to Response]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • September 19, 2019: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 16, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 16, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • August 15, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 12, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 05, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 11, 2019: [Sanctions]
  • July 11, 2019: [Response]
  • July 11, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 05, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Order]
  • August 08, 2018: [Leave to]
  • August 08, 2018: [Objection]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 18, 2018: [Reply to Response]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 07, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • April 20, 2018: [Opposition]
  • April 13, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 13, 2018: [Sanctions]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Objection]
  • February 22, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 16, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • February 15, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 02, 2018: [Response]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Compel]
  • January 04, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [USCA Order]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 20, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 19, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 19, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • September 19, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 25, 2017: [Order]
  • August 24, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 24, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Letter(s)]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Reply to Response]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • May 18, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • May 16, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 10, 2017: [Response]
  • May 09, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order]
  • May 03, 2017: [Response]
  • May 02, 2017: [Leave to]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 03, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Response]
  • March 15, 2017: [Reply]
  • March 15, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • March 15, 2017: [Temporary Restraining Order]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Reply]
  • February 21, 2017: [Response]
  • February 21, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 10, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • February 02, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • January 19, 2017: [Stay Discovery]
  • January 18, 2017: [Objection]
  • January 17, 2017: [Request for Hearing]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 17, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • January 13, 2017: [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
  • January 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 13, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • January 04, 2017: [Response]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Substitute Party]
  • December 15, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Minute Order]
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 18, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 16, 2016: [Suggestion of Death]
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 15, 2016: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • November 14, 2016: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order]
  • August 25, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 25, 2016: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.