U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00229
  • Case Name: Van Campen et al v. Richers Trucking Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 05, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Minute Order]
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order]
  • November 02, 2017: [Designation]
  • November 01, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 01, 2017: [Designation]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 30, 2017: [Objection]
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 30, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 30, 2017: [Statement]
  • October 30, 2017: [Proposed Verdict]
  • October 30, 2017: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • October 20, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 19, 2017: [Transcript]
  • October 13, 2017: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 12, 2017: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • October 05, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 05, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2017: [Jury Questionnaires]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • September 28, 2017: [In Limine]
  • September 08, 2017: [Supplement]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 23, 2017: [Oral Ruling on Motion]
  • August 17, 2017: [Transcript]
  • August 15, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 02, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 27, 2017: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 20, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 19, 2017: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 17, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 17, 2017: [Supplement]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 05, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 03, 2017: [Strike]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Transcript]
  • June 29, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • June 26, 2017: [Transcript]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 12, 2017: [Witness List]
  • June 05, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 31, 2017: [Oral Ruling on Motion]
  • May 26, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 25, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 22, 2017: [Supplement]
  • May 19, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • May 12, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 08, 2017: [Request for Hearing]
  • May 08, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 01, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • April 05, 2017: [Response]
  • April 03, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 24, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 16, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 16, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 09, 2017: [Errata]
  • March 08, 2017: [Reply]
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 01, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 21, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 28, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 28, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 14, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 09, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 04, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 26, 2016: [Jury Demand]
  • September 22, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • September 22, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 08, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 31, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.