U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00233
  • Case Name: Anderson v. Baily
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 13, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
  • November 14, 2017: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 11, 2017: [Opposition]
  • August 11, 2017: [Objection]
  • August 10, 2017: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • August 08, 2017: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • August 08, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 08, 2017: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • August 07, 2017: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • August 07, 2017: [Objection]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 01, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 31, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 25, 2017: [In Limine]
  • July 25, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 19, 2017: [In Limine]
  • July 12, 2017: [In Limine]
  • July 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 07, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 05, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order]
  • June 29, 2017: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 19, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 14, 2017: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • June 05, 2017: [Witness List]
  • June 02, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 08, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 05, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 07, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 06, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 06, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 26, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 07, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • September 07, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • September 07, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.