U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00236
  • Case Name: Caldwell et al v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [10th Circuit Filing]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [10th Circuit Filing]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • November 17, 2017: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • November 17, 2017: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • November 06, 2017: [10th Circuit Filing]
  • November 06, 2017: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • November 02, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • October 24, 2017: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • October 24, 2017: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • October 19, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 19, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 19, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 13, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 12, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • September 12, 2017: [Stay Case]
  • September 11, 2017: [Strike]
  • September 11, 2017: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • September 08, 2017: [Supplement]
  • September 05, 2017: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Errata]
  • August 24, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 07, 2017: [Opposition]
  • August 07, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 25, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • July 24, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • July 24, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 24, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Order]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • June 23, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 16, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 16, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • June 16, 2017: [Response]
  • June 16, 2017: [Opposition]
  • June 14, 2017: [Supplement]
  • June 14, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 06, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 06, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • June 01, 2017: [Brief]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 30, 2017: [Reply]
  • May 26, 2017: [Reply]
  • May 19, 2017: [Opposition]
  • May 17, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 05, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 05, 2017: [Witness List]
  • May 05, 2017: [Vacate]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Reply]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Objection]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 28, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 14, 2017: [Compel]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 16, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Scheduling Conference Order]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 01, 2016: [Financial Entry]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 28, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 19, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 19, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order]
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 15, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 15, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 13, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • September 13, 2016: [Jury Demand]
  • September 13, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.