U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00235
  • Case Name: Speight v. Brown Hereford Ranch et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • August 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • July 18, 2017: [Vacating Hearing]
  • July 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • July 05, 2017: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 28, 2017: [Opposition]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 28, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • June 19, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 15, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 14, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 08, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • May 26, 2017: [Witness List]
  • May 25, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 23, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 23, 2017: [Strike]
  • May 22, 2017: [Strike]
  • May 22, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 17, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 08, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 05, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 05, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • May 05, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • May 04, 2017: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 04, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 03, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order]
  • May 03, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 01, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 20, 2017: [Strike]
  • April 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • April 19, 2017: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 15, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 05, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 03, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 01, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 26, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • January 17, 2017: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 12, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • January 11, 2017: [Answer to Intervenor Complaint]
  • January 10, 2017: [Intervenor Complaint]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order]
  • December 19, 2016: [Intervene]
  • December 15, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 15, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 03, 2016: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
October, 2016
  • October 30, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 17, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 17, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 17, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.