U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00238
  • Case Name: Gordon v. TGR Logistics Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • August 14, 2017: [Dismiss Case]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 06, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 14, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 08, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • May 02, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Compel]
  • April 10, 2017: [Discovery Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 01, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 01, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
  • September 16, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • September 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 16, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • September 16, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.