U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00240
  • Case Name: Ferris v. Cheyenne Police Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • September 14, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • September 01, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • August 22, 2017: [In Limine]
  • August 15, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 02, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 02, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 28, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 17, 2017: [Strike]
  • July 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 17, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 10, 2017: [Reply]
  • July 06, 2017: [Designation]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Strike]
  • June 23, 2017: [Supplement]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • June 02, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • May 25, 2017: [Leave to]
  • May 18, 2017: [Strike]
  • May 03, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 09, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 08, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • February 08, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Reply]
  • January 03, 2017: [Opposition]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 29, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 22, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 19, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • December 09, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 09, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 02, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Reply]
  • November 04, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 03, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 02, 2016: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • November 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 01, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 24, 2016: [Supplement]
  • October 18, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 18, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
  • October 13, 2016: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • October 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 13, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • October 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • September 21, 2016: [Jury Demand]
  • September 21, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.