U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00241
  • Case Name: Harris v. Fremont County School District No 25 Superintendent et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 07, 2017: [Dismissing Case]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 05, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 05, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 04, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 04, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 06, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 06, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2017: [Default Judgment]
  • May 04, 2017: [Default Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • March 01, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Service of Process]
  • February 27, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 27, 2017: [Service of Process]
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 13, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 10, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 27, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 27, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.