U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00244
  • Case Name: Avitabile v. State of Wyoming et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [USCA Order (Financial)]
  • March 26, 2018: [USCA Order]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order]
  • October 20, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • October 12, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • October 11, 2017: [10th Circuit Filing]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 02, 2017: [Opposition]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Mandamus]
  • September 12, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • August 24, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • August 24, 2017: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • August 21, 2017: [Order]
  • August 21, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • August 21, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 18, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 18, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • August 18, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability (NOA)]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 25, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 05, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • December 05, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • November 14, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • November 03, 2016: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • November 03, 2016: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order]
  • November 01, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • November 01, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • October 12, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • October 11, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • October 06, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order]
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 03, 2016: [Letter(s)]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 29, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 29, 2016: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.