U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00245
  • Case Name: Reed v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 21, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 16, 2019: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • December 16, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 12, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • November 26, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • November 26, 2019: [Strike]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Dismiss]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [10th Circuit Filing]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [10th Circuit Filing]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [USCA Order]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [USCA Mandate Recalled]
  • December 21, 2018: [USCA Order]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
  • July 06, 2018: [Supplement]
  • July 05, 2018: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 14, 2018: [Supplement]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 25, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order on 2255 Motion]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Reply to Response]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Order]
  • January 23, 2018: [Reply]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 16, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 16, 2018: [Response]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
October, 2017
  • October 06, 2017: [Set Aside]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Reply]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 15, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 27, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 16, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • November 15, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • November 04, 2016: [Supplement]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • October 03, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 03, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • October 03, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.