U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00246
  • Case Name: American Wild Horse Preservation Campaign et al v. United States Department of the Interior Secretary et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Financial Entry]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Dismissing Case]
  • October 27, 2016: [Response]
  • October 24, 2016: [Response]
  • October 21, 2016: [Response]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • October 18, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • October 14, 2016: [Reply]
  • October 13, 2016: [Reply]
  • October 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 11, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • October 06, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 06, 2016: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2016: [Intervene]
  • October 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 05, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 05, 2016: [Intervene]
  • October 05, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order]
  • October 04, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 03, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 03, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 03, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.