U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00247
  • Case Name: Warren v. Aries Logistics Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Receipt for Exhibits]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 04, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Disbursement of Funds]
  • November 08, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 08, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • September 06, 2018: [Opposition]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
  • August 24, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order]
  • August 23, 2018: [Disbursement of Funds]
  • August 23, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • August 23, 2018: [Request for Hearing]
  • August 23, 2018: [Response]
  • August 23, 2018: [Intervene]
  • August 08, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • August 07, 2018: [Application for Writ]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Transcript Letter]
  • July 19, 2018: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • July 19, 2018: [Transcript Letter]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 16, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 16, 2018: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • July 16, 2018: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • July 13, 2018: [Order]
  • July 06, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 05, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 05, 2018: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • July 05, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 03, 2018: [Notice of Joinder]
  • July 03, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 03, 2018: [Enforce Judgment]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order]
  • July 03, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 03, 2018: [Amended Notice of Appeal]
  • July 03, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Transcript]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 26, 2018: [Reply]
  • January 26, 2018: [Leave to]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order]
  • January 25, 2018: [Transcript]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • January 22, 2018: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • January 22, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 18, 2018: [Transcript]
  • January 11, 2018: [Transcript]
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • January 08, 2018: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 08, 2018: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • January 08, 2018: [New Trial]
  • January 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 04, 2018: [Objection]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 28, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • December 26, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • December 21, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • December 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 11, 2017: [Jury Verdict]
  • December 11, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • December 11, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • December 11, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • December 08, 2017: [Deposition]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • December 08, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • December 07, 2017: [Directed Verdict]
  • December 07, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • December 06, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • December 05, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 04, 2017: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • December 04, 2017: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • December 04, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • December 01, 2017: [In Limine]
  • December 01, 2017: [Response]
  • December 01, 2017: [Objection]
  • December 01, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • November 30, 2017: [Response]
  • November 30, 2017: [Objection]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 29, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 29, 2017: [Proposed Verdict]
  • November 29, 2017: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 28, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • November 28, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 28, 2017: [Objection]
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 27, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 27, 2017: [Objection]
  • November 24, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 24, 2017: [Proposed Verdict]
  • November 24, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 22, 2017: [Transcript]
  • November 20, 2017: [Objection]
  • November 17, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • November 16, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 16, 2017: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • November 15, 2017: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • November 14, 2017: [Transcript - SEALED]
  • November 08, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • November 06, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • November 03, 2017: [Proposed Verdict]
  • November 03, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 03, 2017: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 03, 2017: [Reply to Response]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 24, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
  • October 23, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 20, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 19, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 17, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • October 12, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 11, 2017: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • October 11, 2017: [Notice of Joinder]
  • October 11, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • October 10, 2017: [In Limine]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 28, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 28, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 27, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 27, 2017: [Order]
  • September 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 26, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 20, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order]
  • September 20, 2017: [In Limine]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 14, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 10, 2017: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • January 13, 2017: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • January 13, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • January 06, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 27, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 15, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 12, 2016: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Consolidate Cases for Trial]
  • October 20, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 03, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.