U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00249
  • Case Name: England v. Swift Transportation CO of Arizona LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 21, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 22, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 09, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 12, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 05, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • November 09, 2016: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 24, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 24, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 24, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 05, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 05, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • October 05, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.