U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00270
  • Case Name: Vincent v. Hampleman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Receipt for Exhibits]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Transcript Letter]
  • September 09, 2020: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • September 09, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • September 07, 2020: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • September 07, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • June 22, 2020: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • June 19, 2020: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • June 09, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 09, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Reply]
  • April 10, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 03, 2020: [Strike]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • March 23, 2020: [Brief]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 04, 2020: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • March 04, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • March 03, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 03, 2020: [Supplement]
  • March 03, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 26, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • February 26, 2020: [New Trial]
  • February 18, 2020: [Bill of Costs]
  • February 04, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2020: [Deposition]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 27, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • January 27, 2020: [Jury Verdict]
  • January 27, 2020: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • January 24, 2020: [Jury Trial]
  • January 24, 2020: [Jury Question]
  • January 23, 2020: [Jury Trial]
  • January 23, 2020: [Transcript]
  • January 22, 2020: [Jury Question]
  • January 22, 2020: [Jury Trial]
  • January 21, 2020: [Jury Question]
  • January 21, 2020: [Jury Trial]
  • January 17, 2020: [Jury Question]
  • January 17, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 17, 2020: [Jury Trial]
  • January 16, 2020: [Jury Question]
  • January 16, 2020: [Jury Trial]
  • January 15, 2020: [Jury Question]
  • January 15, 2020: [Jury Trial]
  • January 14, 2020: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • January 13, 2020: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • January 13, 2020: [(TRMD)Jury Selection]
  • January 13, 2020: [Jury Selection]
  • January 11, 2020: [Return of Subpoena]
  • January 08, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • January 07, 2020: [Witness List]
  • January 06, 2020: [Witness List]
  • January 04, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 04, 2020: [Trial Brief]
  • January 03, 2020: [Witness List]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 23, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Exhibit]
  • November 25, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 25, 2019: [Proposed Verdict]
  • November 25, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2019: [Proposed Verdict]
  • October 18, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 18, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • October 17, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 09, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • October 04, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 30, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 27, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 27, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • September 25, 2019: [Trial Brief]
  • September 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 20, 2019: [Compel]
  • September 20, 2019: [Sanctions]
  • September 20, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 20, 2019: [Objection]
  • September 17, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • September 09, 2019: [Reply]
  • September 09, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • September 09, 2019: [Exhibit]
  • September 06, 2019: [Reply]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 30, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2019: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • August 16, 2019: [In Limine]
  • August 13, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 16, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • June 03, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • May 24, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 10, 2019: [Statement]
  • May 10, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 10, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 11, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2019: [Supplement]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 06, 2019: [Supplement]
  • March 01, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 06, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 04, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 16, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Transcript]
  • September 14, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • September 13, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • September 06, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • July 31, 2018: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 04, 2017: [Reply]
  • August 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 02, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 21, 2017: [Brief]
  • July 21, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • July 07, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • June 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 23, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 16, 2017: [Financial Entry]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Reply Brief]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 28, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 12, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 09, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 09, 2016: [Dismiss Case]
  • December 09, 2016: [Dismiss]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 21, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 09, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.