U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00272
  • Case Name: Gas Sensing Technology Corp et al v. Ashton et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • July 14, 2017: [Reply]
  • July 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • May 10, 2017: [Reply]
  • May 10, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 01, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 14, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 13, 2017: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 12, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 12, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 11, 2017: [Dismissing Party]
  • April 10, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • April 10, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 10, 2017: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • April 06, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order]
  • March 28, 2017: [Show Cause]
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 14, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice of Joinder]
  • March 10, 2017: [Dismiss Case]
  • March 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 10, 2017: [Notice of Joinder]
  • March 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 10, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 10, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • March 10, 2017: [Brief]
  • March 10, 2017: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • March 10, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 09, 2017: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • March 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 10, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 09, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order]
  • February 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 06, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order]
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 20, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 19, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • December 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order]
  • December 28, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 27, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 27, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • December 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 27, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 27, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 23, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: [Jury Demand]
  • November 02, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice of Complexity]
  • November 02, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.