U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00276
  • Case Name: Goodridge v. EPI Consultants
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 19, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • December 18, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 11, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 06, 2017: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • December 05, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 01, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 19, 2017: [Request for Hearing]
  • October 19, 2017: [Response]
  • October 19, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 18, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 09, 2017: [Request for Hearing]
  • October 06, 2017: [In Limine]
  • October 06, 2017: [Strike]
  • October 06, 2017: [Request for Hearing]
  • October 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 06, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 05, 2017: [In Limine]
  • October 05, 2017: [Strike]
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 01, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 06, 2017: [Response]
  • July 05, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Financial Entry]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 29, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • March 27, 2017: [Leave to]
  • March 22, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order]
  • March 03, 2017: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • March 03, 2017: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Reassigning Case]
  • February 03, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 03, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 30, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 30, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 13, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 09, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 05, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • January 03, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 14, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 07, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 07, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 07, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 18, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 17, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 16, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 11, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 07, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.