U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00248
  • Case Name: Wilcox v. Social Security Administration Acting Commissioner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 23, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 09, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 09, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • March 02, 2020: [Response]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Show Cause]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Status Report]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Status Report]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Status Report]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 10, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • November 02, 2017: [Stipulation]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 30, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 01, 2017: [Remanding Case to US Agency]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • June 13, 2017: [Response]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Remand]
  • May 15, 2017: [Financial Entry]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • April 25, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Rule 16 Scheduling Order]
  • March 15, 2017: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
  • March 15, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 02, 2017: [Withdrawal of Document]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 09, 2017: [Dismiss]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 13, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 08, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.