U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00277
  • Case Name: Lewis et al v. Amco Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 02, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Status Conference]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 21, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 09, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 26, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 25, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • January 18, 2017: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • January 18, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 10, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 09, 2017: [Vacate]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • December 12, 2016: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • December 07, 2016: [State Court Docket Sheet]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • November 16, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 14, 2016: [Removal]
  • November 09, 2016: [Complaint]
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.