U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00278
  • Case Name: Magallanes v. Harding et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Misdirected Appeal Document]
  • November 06, 2017: [Misdirected Appeal Document]
  • November 06, 2017: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 17, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • October 17, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 17, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 16, 2017: [Brief]
  • October 16, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 16, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • October 16, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 04, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Strike]
  • June 21, 2017: [Reply]
  • June 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 06, 2017: [Reply]
  • June 02, 2017: [Reply]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 26, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 26, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 27, 2017: [Compel]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 20, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • March 20, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • March 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 20, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • March 08, 2017: [Dismissing Party]
  • March 03, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • February 28, 2017: [Dismissing Party]
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 15, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 15, 2017: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • February 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 13, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • February 13, 2017: [Martinez Report]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 23, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order]
  • January 23, 2017: [Compel]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order]
  • January 11, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 11, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • January 05, 2017: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • December 30, 2016: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 23, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 19, 2016: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • December 16, 2016: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • December 15, 2016: [Requiring Martinez Report]
  • December 15, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Brief]
  • November 10, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 10, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 10, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.