U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00284
  • Case Name: Ratchford et al v. Francis Drilling Fluids Ltd
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 11, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Supplement]
  • November 13, 2017: [In Limine]
  • November 13, 2017: [Jury Questionnaires]
  • November 06, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 27, 2017: [In Limine]
  • October 24, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 13, 2017: [Acceptance of Service]
  • October 13, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • September 19, 2017: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • September 19, 2017: [Status Conference]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • August 17, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • August 17, 2017: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • August 16, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 15, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 07, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • August 04, 2017: [Vacate]
  • August 03, 2017: [Minute Order]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 20, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 14, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 11, 2017: [Supplement]
  • July 11, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 05, 2017: [Supplement]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 28, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 19, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 16, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • June 12, 2017: [Opposition]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order]
  • June 12, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 01, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 30, 2017: [Leave to]
  • May 30, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 19, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 15, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 12, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 12, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 12, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.