U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00285
  • Case Name: State of Wyoming et al v. United States Department of the Interior et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 24, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Transcript Letter]
  • January 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 05, 2021: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 29, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 28, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 22, 2020: [Amended Notice of Appeal]
  • December 22, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 21, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 21, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 04, 2020: [Reply Brief]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Response]
  • August 18, 2020: [Response]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order]
  • July 28, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay]
  • July 20, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 20, 2020: [Lift Stay]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 14, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 31, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Reply]
  • July 19, 2019: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • July 12, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 01, 2019: [Errata]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 28, 2019: [Stay Case]
  • June 28, 2019: [Statement]
  • June 11, 2019: [Minute Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 22, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 18, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 04, 2018: [USCA Order]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [USCA Order]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 01, 2018: [USCA Order]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • April 24, 2018: [Transcript Letter]
  • April 20, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • April 20, 2018: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • April 18, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • April 17, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • April 16, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 09, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 09, 2018: [Minute Order]
  • April 06, 2018: [Stay Case]
  • April 06, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 06, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 06, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 05, 2018: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • April 05, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 05, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • March 23, 2018: [Reply Brief]
  • March 23, 2018: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 23, 2018: [Reply]
  • March 16, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 14, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 09, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 07, 2018: [Response]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 05, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 02, 2018: [Response to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 28, 2018: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • February 28, 2018: [Vacate]
  • February 28, 2018: [Lift Stay]
  • February 26, 2018: [Lift Stay]
  • February 22, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 12, 2018: [Status Report]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Brief]
  • January 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 27, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 27, 2017: [Opposition]
  • December 26, 2017: [Stay Case]
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 15, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 15, 2017: [Leave to]
  • December 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 12, 2017: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • December 12, 2017: [Vacating Hearing]
  • December 11, 2017: [Response]
  • December 11, 2017: [Brief]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 29, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 07, 2017: [Objection]
  • November 02, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • October 27, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 27, 2017: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 27, 2017: [Leave to]
  • October 27, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 24, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 20, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • October 18, 2017: [Transcript]
  • October 12, 2017: [Brief]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 10, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 10, 2017: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 06, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 05, 2017: [Errata]
  • October 02, 2017: [Brief]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 28, 2017: [Leave to]
  • September 05, 2017: [Status Report]
  • September 01, 2017: [Status Report]
August, 2017
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 22, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 21, 2017: [Opposition]
  • June 20, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 10, 2017: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • May 09, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • May 08, 2017: [Response]
  • May 05, 2017: [Status Report]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 05, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 18, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 05, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2017: [Reply]
  • April 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 30, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • March 24, 2017: [Petition for Review]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 21, 2017: [Intervene]
  • March 21, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 03, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 03, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • January 12, 2017: [Petition for Review]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • January 09, 2017: [Intervene]
  • January 08, 2017: [Intervene]
  • January 06, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 23, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • December 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • December 22, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 21, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 16, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • December 16, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 15, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 15, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order]
  • December 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 15, 2016: [Intervene]
  • December 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 14, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 13, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • December 09, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 08, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • December 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • December 07, 2016: [Consolidating Case]
  • December 07, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 07, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 05, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 02, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 02, 2016: [Intervene]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 30, 2016: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • November 30, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • November 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 28, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • November 28, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 23, 2016: [Intervene]
  • November 23, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 23, 2016: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 22, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 18, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • November 18, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.