U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00289
  • Case Name: Gadeco LLC et al v. Bureau of Land Managment Wyoming State Office et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Financial Entry]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 11, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • December 16, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • December 16, 2016: [Reply]
  • December 15, 2016: [Opposition]
  • December 15, 2016: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • December 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 09, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 05, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2016: [Setting Hearing]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 28, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 23, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 22, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 22, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • November 22, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.