U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00288
  • Case Name: Grainger v. Carter
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Order]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 19, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 06, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 06, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 14, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • September 14, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 14, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 11, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 24, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 24, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • February 22, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • February 07, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • February 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • January 13, 2017: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 12, 2017: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • January 12, 2017: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Removal]
  • November 29, 2016: [Jury Demand]
  • November 29, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 22, 2016: [Complaint]
  • November 22, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.