U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00290
  • Case Name: Sullivan v. Eaglestone Ranch Homeowners Association et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Mandate]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Transcript Letter]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • September 20, 2017: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • September 07, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 07, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 07, 2017: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Reply]
  • July 10, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 13, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • June 02, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 15, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 25, 2017: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 07, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 06, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 22, 2017: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • March 22, 2017: [Reassigning Case]
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: [Reply to Response]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 17, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • January 12, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • January 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order]
  • December 27, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 27, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • November 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 23, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.