U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00293
  • Case Name: Vester Investments LLC v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • May 22, 2017: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • May 15, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 02, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 01, 2017: [Dismiss]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Status Conference]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 13, 2017: [Status Conference]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 06, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • January 24, 2017: [Stay Case]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • December 16, 2016: [Stay Case]
  • December 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 28, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 25, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • November 25, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.